Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1064 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14470 Week
» 67486 Month
» 187013 Year
» 3213866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2628 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9730 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69730 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
312 |
Works Number |
1701 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2628 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1701 |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9730 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69730 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69730 |
|
|