Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3888 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17294 Week
» 70310 Month
» 189837 Year
» 3216690 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1646 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9418 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
69418 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
N9 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/01/1951 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SUN |
Sunderland |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
w/e |
27/08/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1923 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
02/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1944 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1944 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1646 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
|
01/01/1923 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
02/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9418 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69418 |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) |
|
|
27/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
01/01/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69418 |
|
|