|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
30/04/1962 | N10 0-6-2T\'s extinct | The Worsdell ex-N.E.R. Class N10 0-6-2Ts became extinct when 69097, 69101 an 69109 of Bowes Bridge, sub to Gateshead (52A) were simultaneously condemned during April. Built as N.E.R. Class U. the twenty locos ultimately became L.N.E.R. Class N10. All passed into B.R. at Nationalisation and withdrawals began with L.N.E.R. 9103 in November, 1948. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1148 Built at Darlington Works |
||
09/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
03/1944 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
03/1944 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed | ||
03/1944 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9101 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Northallerton (NLN) | ||
11/1949 | Modification | Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69101 | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
17/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
02/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69101 | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |