Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
209 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9209 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9128 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69128 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 209 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19161 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9209 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9128 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69128 |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69128 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|