|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1925 | 12/03/1926 | 82 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3490 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1927 | 07/03/1928 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1932 | 29/10/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1934 | 21/07/1934 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1938 | 27/08/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 4402 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1947 | 11/11/1947 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9388 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63935 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1951 | 13/02/1951 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1954 | 21/05/1954 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21015 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 49 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28591 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1959 | 12/12/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1960 | 03/01/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28956 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 490 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1577 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
21/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 12/03/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3490 |
||
30/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1927. Dep: 07/03/1928. | ||
07/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
20/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. | ||
01/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934. | ||
01/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. | ||
06/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. | ||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. | ||
19/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. | ||
06/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4402 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
09/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3935 | ||
10/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1947. Dep: 11/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9388 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63935 |
||
20/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
23/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1951. Dep: 13/02/1951. | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
19/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 21/05/1954. | ||
05/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21015 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28591 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959. | ||
26/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1960. Dep: 03/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28956 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63935 from Grantham (34F) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |