|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1927 | 02/04/1927 | 89 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7515 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 8 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1944 | 29/07/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1948 | 19/05/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63942 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1950 | 23/10/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1952 | 13/10/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21059 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1961 | 22/04/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1962 | 02/06/1962 | 97 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/03/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3497 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1587 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1927. Dep: 02/04/1927. | ||
22/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. | ||
26/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7515 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. | ||
11/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. | ||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. | ||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. | ||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. | ||
19/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3942 | ||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
11/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1948. Dep: 19/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63942 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1950. Dep: 23/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1952. Dep: 13/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21059 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
20/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 02/06/1962. | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63942 from Grantham (34F) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |