|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1925 | 05/04/1925 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1926 | 12/03/1927 | 99 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1929 | 23/03/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1931 | 15/08/1931 | 43 days | General | Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1935 | 07/09/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1937 | 16/10/1937 | 22 days | General | Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1939 | 27/01/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1941 | 17/01/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1947 | 11/07/1947 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1948 | 31/03/1948 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63944 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1949 | 11/03/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1951 | 05/10/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1951 | 07/01/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1954 | 04/06/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1956 | 23/08/1956 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1960 | 23/12/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1961 | 03/04/1961 | 8 days | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/04/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3499 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1592 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
13/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1925. Dep: 05/04/1925. | ||
04/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927. | ||
09/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929. | ||
04/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931. Work undertaken: Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted |
||
04/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 07/09/1935. | ||
25/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937. Work undertaken: Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
||
16/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942. | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
30/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3944 | ||
30/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1947. Dep: 11/07/1947. | ||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
12/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1948. Dep: 31/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63944 |
||
31/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1949. Dep: 11/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 05/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 07/01/1952. | ||
09/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1954. Dep: 04/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956. | ||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
12/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. | ||
14/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1960. Dep: 23/12/1960. | ||
27/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/03/1961. Dep: 03/04/1961. | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
03/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63944 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |