|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1936 | 17/09/1936 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1937 | 01/10/1937 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1942 | 07/11/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1946 | 15/11/1946 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9387 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1947 | 02/10/1947 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1949 | 10/06/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 9361 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63953 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1950 | 28/11/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1952 | 17/11/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1955 | 15/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1959 | 04/03/1959 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/07/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2960 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1779 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
20/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. | ||
05/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1936. Dep: 17/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1937. Dep: 01/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. | ||
28/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. | ||
03/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3953 | ||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 15/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9387 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1947. Dep: 02/10/1947. | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9361 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63953 |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 28/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 17/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1959. Dep: 04/03/1959. | ||
08/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63953 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |