|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1947 | 05/11/1947 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1947 | 05/01/1948 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1949 | 08/04/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63966 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1951 | 19/03/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21017 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1953 | 13/05/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1955 | 21/04/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21032 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1957 | 24/01/1958 | 37 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1960 | 24/09/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/07/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3836 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1934 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
28/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3966 | ||
22/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
09/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1947. Dep: 05/11/1947. | ||
12/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1947. Dep: 05/01/1948. | ||
08/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1949. Dep: 08/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63966 |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
18/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 19/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21017 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 13/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21032 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 24/01/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. | ||
16/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63966 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |