|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1922 | 19/06/1922 | 124 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1924 | 11/04/1925 | 135 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3475 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1927 | 01/12/1927 | 146 days | General | Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1930 | 10/05/1930 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1932 | 18/02/1933 | 100 days | General | Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1935 | 23/12/1935 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1937 | 07/01/1938 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1940 | 26/07/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1942 | 14/08/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1943 | 21/06/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1944 | 03/11/1944 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1944 | 04/01/1945 | 25 days | Heavy | Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1946 | 26/09/1946 | 73 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1947 | 24/03/1947 | 62 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1948 | 22/07/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63493 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1949 | 13/12/1949 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 475 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22102 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
16/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1922. Dep: 19/06/1922. | ||
28/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1924. Dep: 11/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3475 |
||
27/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 01/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1932. Dep: 18/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1935. Dep: 23/12/1935. | ||
11/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 07/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 26/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1942. Dep: 14/08/1942. | ||
28/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1943. Dep: 21/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 03/11/1944. | ||
11/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/12/1944. Dep: 04/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
16/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1946. Dep: 26/09/1946. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3493 | ||
22/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1947. Dep: 24/03/1947. | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 22/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63493 |
||
05/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1949. Dep: 13/12/1949. | ||
02/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
19/02/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63493 from Doncaster (36A) |