|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/02/1918 | 22/06/1918 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1505 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1920 | 01/01/1921 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1923 | 02/06/1923 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5069 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 22/03/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1932 | 13/08/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1935 | 03/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1941 | 08/03/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1945 | 30/06/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 08/05/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | Tender only Renumbered to BR 63580 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Converted to Oil Fuel Boiler number 22244 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 043 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 69 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/02/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1918. Dep: 22/06/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1505 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1918 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
30/10/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1920. Dep: 01/01/1921. | ||
03/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923. | ||
08/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5069 |
||
20/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3502 | ||
09/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3580 | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 08/05/1948. Work undertaken: Tender only Renumbered to BR 63580 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
02/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Converted to Oil Fuel Boiler number 22244 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 043 |
||
03/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 043 from Gorton (9G) |