|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/09/1919 | 01/11/1919 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1921 | 05/11/1921 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1924 | 18/10/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5093 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1927 | 03/09/1927 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1935 | 08/1935 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1941 | 01/02/1941 | 15 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1942 | 30/04/1942 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1947 | 01/02/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3582 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63582 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1951 | 22/03/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1953 | 01/08/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1956 | 10/03/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1956 | 04/08/1956 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1959 | 15/08/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 93 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
27/09/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/12/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5093 |
||
28/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. | ||
30/04/1932 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1080 boiler fitted | ||
27/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: ?/08/1935. | ||
17/08/1935 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1876 boiler fitted | ||
29/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1942. Dep: 30/04/1942. | ||
02/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D) |
||
19/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3503 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3582 |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
18/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63582 |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
24/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D) |
||
21/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951. | ||
25/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
27/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 01/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D) |
||
11/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956. | ||
15/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/08/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959. | ||
21/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63582 from Gorton (9G) |