|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/02/1917 | 08/03/1917 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1526 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1920 | 01/09/1920 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1922 | 18/10/1922 | 96 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1924 | 17/01/1925 | 61 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6203 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1927 | 31/05/1927 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1929 | 06/04/1929 | 55 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1930 | 17/02/1931 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1933 | 22/07/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1935 | 20/12/1935 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1947 | 17/10/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63736 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1954 | 29/04/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1954 | 04/05/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1957 | 20/03/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1960 | 01/07/1960 | 33 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1203 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19859 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
27/08/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/02/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1917. Dep: 08/03/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1526 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1920. Dep: 01/09/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1922. Dep: 18/10/1922. | ||
18/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6203 |
||
15/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
29/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
14/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1927. Dep: 31/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929. | ||
01/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1930. Dep: 17/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/02/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
12/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
03/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. | ||
24/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
30/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3550 | ||
02/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3736 | ||
07/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1947. Dep: 17/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63736 |
||
15/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1954. Dep: 04/05/1954. | ||
08/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957. | ||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960. | ||
29/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63736 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |