|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/12/1917 | 02/03/1918 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1471 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1920 | 27/11/1920 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1923 | 27/10/1923 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6212 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1928 | 25/02/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1932 | 14/05/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1935 | 02/11/1935 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1212 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19868 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
14/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
01/12/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1917. Dep: 02/03/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1471 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1920. Dep: 27/11/1920. | ||
07/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6212 |
||
14/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 25/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935. | ||
27/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6212 from Annesley (ANN) | ||
16/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 719 |