|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1917 | 27/04/1918 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1516 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1922 | 11/11/1922 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1925 | 18/04/1925 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6213 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1927 | 19/11/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1930 | 22/03/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1938 | 30/04/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1948 | 17/04/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63773 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1950 | 11/02/1950 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1951 | 07/04/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1954 | 16/10/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1213 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19869 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/12/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1917. Dep: 27/04/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1516 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 11/11/1922. | ||
07/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6213 |
||
08/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 19/11/1927. | ||
01/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
12/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3560 | ||
06/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3773 | ||
20/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63773 |
||
02/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY) | ||
03/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY) | ||
05/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. | ||
26/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. | ||
11/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950. | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
10/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. | ||
30/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
15/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
26/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63773 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |