|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/03/1918 | 05/10/1918 | 204 days | General | Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1920 | 06/11/1920 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1923 | 30/06/1923 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1926 | 27/03/1926 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6230 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1929 | 15/06/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1933 | 03/06/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3375 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 772 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1230 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19886 Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/03/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1918. Dep: 05/10/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1920. Dep: 06/11/1920. | ||
24/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6230 |
||
04/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929. | ||
15/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
28/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
09/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3375 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 772 |
||
18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 772 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |