|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/08/1918 | 18/01/1919 | 152 days | General | Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1921 | 20/08/1921 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1503 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1926 | 24/04/1926 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6248 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1928 | 28/07/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1930 | 06/09/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1933 | 29/04/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1935 | 31/12/1935 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1938 | 09/04/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 12 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63595 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1958 | 24/05/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1961 | 15/04/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1248 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19904 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/08/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1918. Dep: 18/01/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1921. Dep: 20/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1503 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
20/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6248 |
||
26/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 31/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) |
||
15/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D) |
||
14/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3595 | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63595 |
||
03/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
26/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D) |
||
15/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
19/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D) |
||
15/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/04/1961. Dep: 15/04/1961. | ||
21/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63595 from Frodingham (36C) |