|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/07/1921 | 27/08/1921 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1437 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1923 | 03/11/1923 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1925 | 20/02/1926 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5384 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 8 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1935 | 09/11/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1937 | 16/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 8 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 03/01/1948 | 4 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1949 | 21/05/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63609 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1952 | 29/03/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22253 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1954 | 25/12/1954 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 384 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/07/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
30/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1921. Dep: 27/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1437 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5384 |
||
11/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
23/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. | ||
02/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. | ||
11/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3609 | ||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. | ||
09/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
23/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63609 |
||
08/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1952. Dep: 29/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22253 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954. | ||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63609 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |