|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/07/1921 | 01/10/1921 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1923 | 24/10/1923 | 82 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1926 | 08/06/1926 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5390 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1928 | 17/07/1928 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1930 | 25/09/1930 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1934 | 19/07/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15) Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 37 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1942 | 14/11/1942 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1945 | 05/05/1945 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1947 | 28/04/1947 | 94 days | General | Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1948 | 21/10/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63615 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1951 | 12/01/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1954 | 29/04/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 66 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1960 | 14/01/1961 | 48 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 390 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
23/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1921. Dep: 01/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 24/10/1923. | ||
31/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1926. Dep: 08/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5390 |
||
30/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1928. Dep: 17/07/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 25/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1934. Dep: 19/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15) Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
||
20/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
03/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D) |
||
11/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
21/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3615 | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 28/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
11/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 21/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63615 |
||
25/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. | ||
13/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1951. Dep: 12/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D) |
||
29/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D) |
||
24/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
28/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. | ||
24/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1960. Dep: 14/01/1961. | ||
25/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
22/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63615 from Langwith Junction (41J) |