|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/03/1927 | 04/06/1927 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6569 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1933 | 18/02/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1935 | 20/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1941 | 09/08/1941 | 6 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 11 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1817 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21784 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6569 |
||
03/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/06/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. | ||
07/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
11/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. | ||
21/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 742 from Frodingham (FRO) | ||
21/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 742 |