|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6284 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1924 | 11/12/1924 | 151 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1927 | 08/07/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1929 | 14/10/1929 | 105 days | General | Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1931 | 06/10/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1938 | 11/05/1938 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1940 | 21/09/1940 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1942 | 24/12/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1945 | 23/02/1946 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1948 | 17/05/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63744 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1950 | 14/12/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1953 | 22/02/1953 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1955 | 02/09/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1960 | 22/11/1960 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1961 | 03/10/1961 | 28 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton MPD | Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1819 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21786 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6284 |
||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
14/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1924. Dep: 11/12/1924. | ||
20/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1927. Dep: 08/07/1927. | ||
02/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1929. Dep: 14/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1931. Dep: 06/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
28/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1938. Dep: 11/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
30/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1945. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3744 | ||
04/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1948. Dep: 17/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63744 |
||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. | ||
12/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 14/12/1950. | ||
15/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 22/02/1953. | ||
30/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1960. Dep: 22/11/1960. | ||
06/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1961. Dep: 03/10/1961. | ||
19/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63744 from Frodingham (36C) |