|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/04/1927 | 23/07/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6571 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1930 | 01/02/1930 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1934 | 28/07/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1936 | 05/09/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1938 | 15/10/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1942 | 14/02/1942 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1942 | 27/11/1942 | 16 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1948 | 14/02/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3746 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5117 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63746 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 8 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1950 | 04/11/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1956 | 06/10/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1962 | 22/05/1962 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1962 | 02/07/1962 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1821 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21788 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2963 | ||
23/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6571 |
||
25/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
25/07/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
26/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. | ||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930. | ||
23/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/09/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938. | ||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1942. Dep: 14/02/1942. | ||
12/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1942. Dep: 27/11/1942. | ||
27/11/1943 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3245 boiler fitted | ||
11/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3746 | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
31/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3746 |
||
11/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5117 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63746 |
||
05/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. | ||
14/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951. | ||
08/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. | ||
18/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. | ||
31/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. | ||
01/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1956. Dep: 06/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
31/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. | ||
27/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1962. Dep: 22/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1962. Dep: 02/07/1962. | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
27/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63746 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |