|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/02/1927 | 14/05/1927 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6572 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1935 | 14/12/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1938 | 28/05/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 13/06/1942 | 18/07/1942 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1945 | 19/05/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1947 | 26/07/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 22 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 63747 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1950 | 28/09/1950 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1952 | 07/11/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22873 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1824 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21791 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6572 |
||
12/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
12/05/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
10/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. | ||
27/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. | ||
13/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1942. Dep: 18/07/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) |
||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3747 | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
21/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63747 |
||
25/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
31/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
19/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 28/09/1950. | ||
18/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D) |
||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952. | ||
23/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22873 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/05/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. | ||
18/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63747 from Frodingham (36C) |