|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/06/1925 | 26/09/1925 | 113 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6507 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1928 | 20/10/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1931 | 24/01/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 74 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 15 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3784 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1948 | 07/08/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 5115 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63784 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1950 | 13/01/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1952 | 22/11/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1955 | 16/04/1955 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1957 | 26/01/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1961 | 27/05/1961 | 29 days | Heavy Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1881 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21858 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6507 |
||
25/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/09/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1928. Dep: 20/10/1928. | ||
18/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 24/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. | ||
23/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3784 | ||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3784 |
||
03/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5115 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63784 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
23/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955. | ||
05/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1957. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
24/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. | ||
29/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961. | ||
29/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63784 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |