|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/08/1927 | 01/10/1927 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6592 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 09/12/1929 | 59 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1932 | 15/07/1932 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1935 | 23/02/1935 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1939 | 17/09/1939 | 55 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1941 | 08/11/1941 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3788 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1947 | 22/09/1947 | 99 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1948 | 27/02/1948 | 4 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3788 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to BR 63788 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 59 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1951 | 12/12/1951 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1954 | 08/05/1954 | 48 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1956 | 07/01/1956 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 45 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 24 days | HfI | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1962 | 04/08/1962 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1886 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21863 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6592 |
||
30/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
30/09/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 09/12/1929. | ||
06/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1932. Dep: 15/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1939. Dep: 17/09/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A) |
||
21/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941. | ||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
30/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A) |
||
26/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3788 |
||
16/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/06/1947. Dep: 22/09/1947. | ||
24/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 27/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3788 |
||
20/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to BR 63788 |
||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. | ||
27/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 12/12/1951. | ||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. | ||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954. | ||
03/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 07/01/1956. | ||
31/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/06/1959 | Works Visit | |||
23/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 04/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63788 from Doncaster (36A) |