|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/04/1927 | 30/07/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6602 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1929 | 26/10/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1935 | 15/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1937 | 10/04/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 780 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1920 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21897 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6602 |
||
02/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
02/08/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929. | ||
19/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
01/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 15/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 780 |
||
04/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 780 from Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |