|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/10/1927 | 21/01/1928 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6605 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1930 | 07/06/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1932 | 21/05/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1934 | 06/10/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1872 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3282 (Diagram 15) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 16 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1927 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21904 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6605 |
||
17/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
17/01/1928 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
03/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1872 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3282 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. | ||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 764 from Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
19/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 764 |