|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/07/1927 | 25/08/1927 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6606 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1930 | 03/09/1930 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1933 | 11/03/1933 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 68 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 30 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1948 | 06/11/1948 | 51 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63816 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 22341 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 87 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1956 | 29/06/1956 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 55 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1960 | 09/09/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1960 | 26/09/1960 | 7 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1961 | 26/01/1961 | 6 days | Unclassified | Tender weatherboard fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1929 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21906 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 25/08/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6606 |
||
25/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/08/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 03/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/05/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
10/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A) |
||
23/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. | ||
13/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A) |
||
20/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
05/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
12/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
09/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A) |
||
29/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
27/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3816 | ||
17/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63816 |
||
26/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22341 (Diagram 15A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
23/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
24/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. | ||
08/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 29/06/1956. | ||
30/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. | ||
09/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1960. Dep: 09/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1960. Dep: 26/09/1960. | ||
21/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1961. Dep: 26/01/1961. Work undertaken: Tender weatherboard fitted |
||
15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63816 from Colwick (16B) |