|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/01/1924 | 19/01/1924 | 7 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1259c |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6259 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1926 | 28/12/1926 | 61 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1929 | 14/05/1929 | 121 days | General | Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1930 | 24/02/1931 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1933 | 26/05/1933 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1935 | 09/08/1935 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1937 | 24/12/1937 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1946 | 11/05/1946 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1948 | 17/04/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63822 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1955 | 14/10/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1955 | 19/10/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1958 | 24/12/1958 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28977 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1958 | 05/01/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 20 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1948 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22006 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
13/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1924. Dep: 19/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1259c |
||
19/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
02/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
14/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6259 |
||
29/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1926. Dep: 28/12/1926. | ||
14/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1929. Dep: 14/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1930. Dep: 24/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1933. Dep: 26/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1935. Dep: 09/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3822 | ||
01/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63822 |
||
14/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. | ||
01/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 14/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955. | ||
29/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1958. Dep: 24/12/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28977 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 05/01/1959. | ||
12/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
01/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
20/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63822 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |