|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/11/1925 | 23/01/1926 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6523 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1928 | 07/07/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1932 | 16/01/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1941 | 18/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3837 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1948 | 18/12/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63837 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22217 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1954 | 03/03/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1979 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22037 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2893 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
14/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6523 |
||
21/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/01/1926 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
30/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928. | ||
23/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 16/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
22/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
03/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
04/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3837 |
||
29/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
20/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63837 |
||
25/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
22/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22217 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 03/03/1954. | ||
24/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
28/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
27/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63837 from Colwick (40E) |