|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/12/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 23 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6524 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1928 | 02/1928 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1929 | 07/03/1930 | 119 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1932 | 07/01/1932 | -1 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1934 | 07/05/1934 | 12 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1936 | 06/06/1936 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1938 | 06/1938 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1940 | 07/08/1940 | -5 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1947 | 01/10/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1950 | 11/11/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63840 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1950 | 22/11/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 80 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1958 | 18/10/1958 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1960 | 25/06/1960 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1993 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22051 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6524 |
||
31/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/12/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
14/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: ?/02/1928. | ||
07/02/1928 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 853 boiler fitted | ||
09/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 07/03/1930. | ||
01/1932 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1177 boiler fitted | ||
09/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 07/01/1932. | ||
1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1934. Dep: 07/05/1934. | ||
22/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1936. Dep: 06/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/1938 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 868 boiler fitted | ||
14/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1938. Dep: ?/06/1938. | ||
08/1940 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3324 boiler fitted | ||
13/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1940. Dep: 07/08/1940. | ||
21/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
06/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
25/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
01/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
07/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3840 | ||
03/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1947. Dep: 01/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
15/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63840 |
||
15/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 22/11/1950. | ||
24/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. | ||
23/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958. | ||
16/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63840 from Langwith Junction (41J) |