|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/03/1921 | 16/04/1921 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1923 | 15/09/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1454 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5005 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1929 | 20/04/1929 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1159 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1936 | 25/01/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1942 | 18/04/1942 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63627 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Converted to Oil Fuel Boiler number 22245 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 044 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2006 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5 | ||
05/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921. | ||
17/03/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1454 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
06/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5005 |
||
20/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1159 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
18/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
11/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3627 | ||
04/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63627 |
||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
10/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
02/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Converted to Oil Fuel Boiler number 22245 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 044 |
||
22/02/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 044 from Langwith Junction (40E) |