|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1924 | 15/03/1924 | -113 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1925 | 18/05/1925 | 20 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1927 | 18/11/1927 | 58 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1929 | 20/01/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1931 | 13/02/1932 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1934 | 02/06/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1938 | 23/12/1938 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/03/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1947 | 18/11/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63850 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1952 | 22/11/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 75 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1958 | 08/11/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1962 | 28/09/1962 | 46 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2052 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22143 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2849 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
15/03/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6294 | ||
15/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/07/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. | ||
29/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1925. Dep: 18/05/1925. | ||
22/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1927. Dep: 18/11/1927. | ||
02/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1929. Dep: 20/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1931. Dep: 13/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
20/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3850 | ||
05/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1947. Dep: 18/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
30/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63850 |
||
30/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1962. Dep: 28/09/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
22/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63850 from Langwith Junction (41J) |