|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/05/1925 | 08/08/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6534 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1927 | 11/02/1928 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1934 | 09/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1938 | 08/10/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1943 | 23/10/1943 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1949 | 16/04/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63864 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1951 | 28/07/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22160 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1954 | 16/03/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28846 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1962 | 07/05/1962 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2075 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22166 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6534 |
||
06/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/08/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
17/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928. | ||
08/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
04/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
17/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3864 | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63864 |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1951. Dep: 28/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
13/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22160 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954. | ||
10/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28846 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
07/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/05/1962. Dep: 07/05/1962. | ||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63864 from Ardsley (56B) |