|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 24/11/1927 | 34 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6629 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1929 | 28/12/1929 | 8 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1932 | 07/07/1932 | -8 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1935 | 07/04/1935 | 4 days | General | Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1937 | 14/08/1937 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1940 | 07/02/1940 | -9 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1948 | 04/12/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63873 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1950 | 14/10/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 22875 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 66 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 34 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1959 | 19/05/1959 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1962 | 27/02/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2095 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22185 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 24/11/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6629 |
||
24/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/11/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929. | ||
07/07/1932 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 828 boiler fitted | ||
16/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1932. Dep: 07/07/1932. | ||
07/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
07/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
04/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1935. Dep: 07/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. | ||
07/02/1940 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3385 boiler fitted | ||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 07/02/1940. | ||
22/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
21/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
29/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
17/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3873 | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63873 |
||
14/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22875 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. | ||
22/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 19/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1962. Dep: 27/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63873 from Colwick (16B) |