|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/06/1928 | 22/09/1928 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6635 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1931 | 19/09/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1941 | 09/08/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 113 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5080 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3886 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1948 | 06/11/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 5057 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63886 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1951 | 04/08/1951 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1951 | 09/08/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1951 | 03/11/1951 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1957 | 08/06/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1958 | 14/06/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1958 | 30/08/1958 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1960 | 23/03/1960 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2133 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22223 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
23/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6635 |
||
25/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/09/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
21/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
22/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1931. Dep: 19/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
18/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
17/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
04/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5080 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3886 |
||
04/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5057 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63886 |
||
22/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
18/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 09/08/1951. | ||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951. | ||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. | ||
23/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958. | ||
01/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958. | ||
18/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 23/03/1960. | ||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63886 from Annesley (16D) |