|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/02/1927 | 23/04/1927 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6637 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1929 | 03/08/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1931 | 25/07/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 12 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1947 | 05/02/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3888 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1950 | 01/07/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63888 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1950 | 15/07/1950 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1952 | 20/12/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22110 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1952 | 30/12/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1955 | 24/12/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1960 | 31/03/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2135 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22225 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 23/04/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6637 |
||
22/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/04/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
06/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. | ||
27/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
09/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. | ||
20/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3888 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
26/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1947. Dep: 05/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3888 |
||
17/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63888 |
||
04/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1950. Dep: 15/07/1950. | ||
06/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22110 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952. | ||
19/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1960. Dep: 31/03/1960. | ||
01/04/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63888 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |