|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/02/1921 | 19/03/1921 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1923 | 24/11/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1926 | 22/05/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5414 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1928 | 21/04/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1932 | 17/09/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1934 | 20/10/1934 | 22 days | General | Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1936 | 14/11/1936 | 22 days | General | Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1939 | 04/03/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 6 days | Light Repair | Dragbox altered for Whitemoor hump |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 22 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1947 | 31/01/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3904 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision Renumbered to BR 63904 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22193 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1951 | 01/07/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1958 | 26/04/1958 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1958 | 06/05/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1961 | 15/11/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730. New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764. Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates. No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates |
SLS/194811 |
21/10/1948 | Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) | On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 414 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
05/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921. | ||
05/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
15/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 24/11/1923. | ||
13/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5414 |
||
10/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B) |
||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B) |
||
29/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934. Work undertaken: Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
24/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. Work undertaken: Dragbox altered for Whitemoor hump |
||
02/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
19/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3904 | ||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
27/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1947. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3904 |
||
22/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
21/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
22/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR 63904 |
||
02/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22193 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 01/07/1951. | ||
03/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/07/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954. | ||
09/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/04/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. | ||
29/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958. | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
15/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/11/1961. Dep: 15/11/1961. | ||
23/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63904 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |