Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1212 |
m/e |
04/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8212 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5562 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65562 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G58 |
To Service |
During 04/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/08/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
w/e |
22/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
5w/e |
27/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1212 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8212 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5562 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65562 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
25/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65562 |
|
|