Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16522 Week
» 69538 Month
» 189065 Year
» 3215918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1222 |
m/e |
01/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8222 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5572 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65572 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S59 |
To Service |
During 01/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/12/1957 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1222 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8222 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5572 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65572 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65572 |
|
|