Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 5285 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20897 Week
» 119542 Month
» 322206 Year
» 3349059 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1229 |
m/e |
03/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8229 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5579 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65579 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S59 |
To Service |
During 03/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 29/11/1954 |
Service Life |
48 yrs , 9 mths |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1906 |
SL |
|
South Lynn |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
21/07/1951 |
31D |
|
South Lynn |
5w/e |
21/03/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/11/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/11/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1229 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8229 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5579 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65579 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
29/11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65579 |
|
|