Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4457 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23368 Week
» 88322 Month
» 290986 Year
» 3317839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1236 |
m/e |
12/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8236 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5586 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65586 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T67 |
To Service |
During 12/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/04/1962 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1236 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8236 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5586 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65586 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65586 |
|
|