Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2566 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15972 Week
» 68988 Month
» 188515 Year
» 3215368 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1238 |
m/e |
01/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8238 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5588 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65588 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T67 |
To Service |
During 01/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/05/1961 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1960 |
G.E. Dieselisation |
Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. |
SLS/196101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1238 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8238 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5588 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65588 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
29/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65588 |
|
|