Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1239 |
m/e |
01/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8239 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5589 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65589 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T67 |
To Service |
During 01/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/01/1961 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1239 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8239 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5589 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65589 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
02/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65589 |
|
|