|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1913 | 04/10/1913 | General | Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1916 | 22/07/1916 | General | Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1922 | 06/05/1922 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5049 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1929 | 31/08/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1931 | 15/08/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1933 | 23/09/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 49 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
13/08/1909 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 04/10/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 22/07/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 06/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
14/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5049 |
||
15/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
10/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
29/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. | ||
28/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
25/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
20/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
16/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
06/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/11/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5049 from Mexborough (MEX) |