|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1915 | 20/03/1915 | General | Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1920 | 25/12/1920 | 169 days | General | New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 10/05/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5162 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1926 | 07/08/1926 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1928 | 05/01/1929 | 43 days | General | Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1930 | 04/10/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1934 | 12/01/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 15 days | General | Secondhand R.H. cylinder Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 36 days | General | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1949 | 16/04/1949 | 8 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3774 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to BR 63234 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 162 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
18/10/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 20/03/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
10/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1920. Dep: 25/12/1920. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5162 |
||
24/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 07/08/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 05/01/1929. Work undertaken: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
30/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
12/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
25/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Secondhand R.H. cylinder Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
27/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
04/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
13/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3234 | ||
23/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/04/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3774 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to BR 63234 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
05/03/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63234 from Ardsley (37A) |