|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 16/05/1914 | General | Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 10/07/1920 | General | Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1922 | 23/12/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5163 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1927 | 06/08/1927 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1929 | 16/03/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1930 | 13/12/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1935 | 11/01/1936 | 22 days | General | New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 29 days | General | Secondhand R.H. cylinder Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3235 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 163 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
19/05/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 16/05/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 10/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
21/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. | ||
03/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5163 |
||
25/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
17/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
02/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
10/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
22/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
12/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
06/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
21/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 11/01/1936. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
08/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR) | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. Work undertaken: Secondhand R.H. cylinder Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
03/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3235 | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
21/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3235 |
||
07/05/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3235 from Barnsley (36D) |