|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 11/04/1914 | General | Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1919 | 29/11/1919 | General | Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1921 | 11/02/1922 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5164 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1928 | 29/09/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1934 | 17/02/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 29 days | General | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1943 | 13/03/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1944 | 08/01/1944 | 6 days | Light Repair | New R.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1948 | 15/05/1948 | 22 days | General | New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63236 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 164 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
27/04/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 11/04/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 29/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
03/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 11/02/1922. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5164 |
||
23/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
25/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
16/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
04/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
24/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
03/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder |
||
24/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3236 | ||
24/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63236 |
||
26/05/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63236 from Ardsley (37A) |