|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/12/1915 | 15/07/1916 | 222 days | General | Superheater installed Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1920 | 16/10/1920 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1922 | 03/02/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1924 | 28/02/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5960 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 960 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1915. Dep: 15/07/1916. Work undertaken: Superheater installed Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
17/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1920. Dep: 16/10/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1922. Dep: 03/02/1923. | ||
07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 28/02/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5960 |
||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. | ||
05/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
17/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/05/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5960 from Mexborough (MEX) |