|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/08/1916 | 03/03/1917 | 190 days | General | Returned to UK 13/6/19 Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1919 | 23/08/1919 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1921 | 29/10/1921 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1923 | 23/02/1924 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6180 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1929 | 18/01/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 22 days | Light Repair | New L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1934 | 07/07/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3243 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3777 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63243 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
22/03/1948 | Gorton Works | On 22/3 the following locomotives were observed renumbered: in the Erecting Shop Nos. 63765, 64302, 65197 an 69326, while outside the Erecting Shop were Nos. 62664 an 64407. Also recently ex works were Nos. E3243 and E9288, which apparently are the last locomotives to leave Gorton Works, bearing the short-lived prefix E. | SLS/194805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1180 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
26/08/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1916. Dep: 03/03/1917. Work undertaken: Returned to UK 13/6/19 Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
19/07/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919. | ||
15/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
30/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
22/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 23/02/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6180 |
||
18/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. | ||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
21/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
05/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder |
||
19/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
23/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
07/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
08/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3243 | ||
23/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3243 |
||
09/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3777 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR 63243 |
||
11/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
15/10/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63243 from Ardsley (37A) |